Accounts and annual returns THE CALDICOT MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 512834
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2021 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2021 291 days late