CASTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall is available for hire to persons for meetings, evening/day classes, training for CFR groups,celebrations of birthdays, christenings, weddings. It is also hired for fund raising events, voting facilities for local and general elections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Audrey Sykes | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Karen Leese | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Sally Hodge | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Diane Brenda Moore | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Clayton | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Kenneth Humphris | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
BARBARA JILL HUMPHRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.23k | £9.58k | £8.48k | £7.41k | £4.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.27k | £8.70k | £7.33k | £7.29k | £4.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED 15TH JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CASTERTON. WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CASTERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWGILL
HIGH CASTERTON
CARNFORTH
LA6 2SD
- Phone:
- 07979745128
- Email:
- lowgill@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window