LITTLE HANDS DESIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.1 To advance for the benefit of the public education in the arts and, in particular (but not limited to), the art of fashion design and garment making. 1.2 To advance in life and help young fashion designers in necessitous circumstances by the provision of studio space and education in fashion design.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASTRID JACOBY | Chair | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
AFSANEH PARVIZI-WAYNE | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PRIYA CHANDARIA | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.91k | £66.28k | £62.28k | £21.46k | £112.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.26k | £50.09k | £66.81k | £44.25k | £90.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAY 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
1.1 TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO), THE ART OF FASHION DESIGN AND GARMENT MAKING. 1.2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG FASHION DESIGNERS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF STUDIO SPACE AND EDUCATION IN FASHION DESIGN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
London School Of Mosaic
181 Mansfield Road
LONDON
NW3 2HP
- Phone:
- 07739535684
- Email:
- info@littlehandsdesign.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window