Accounts and annual returns PENNYHILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512837
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 04 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 04 November 2013 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required