BREAD OF LIFE CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives of the Bread of Life Church International (BOLCI) are to advance the Christian faith all-over the UK and worldwide, in accordance with the statement of Faith, creating and maintaining of spiritual and physical wellbeing of members. Our service and act of worship put faith in practice through prayer, scripture reading, learning, giving hands to the needy and signing praises
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 December 2018: CIO registration
- BOLCI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yared Ermias Zeckarias | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tsegaye Fissehay Andom | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Berhanu Ferede | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BiNiyam Gebrekiristos | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Endrias Kululo | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.14k | £94.45k | £126.53k | £137.02k | £203.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.63k | £61.53k | £66.11k | £71.55k | £85.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
“TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING: · A PLACE OF WORSHIP · PASTORAL CARE AND OUTREACH · RELIGIOUS EDUCATION SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 ROSEBERY ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW3 2RE
- Phone:
- 02036094176
- Email:
- bolci@bolci.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window