Accounts and annual returns HEREFORD LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1180411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 August 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 11 August 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 June 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 June 2022 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window