13TH BURTON ON TRENT SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 512846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of The Scout Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, interlectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £12,869
Total expenditure: £6,387

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 13TH BURTON DISTRICT (BAND) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
  • 13TH BURTON DISTRICT BAND SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Charles Chair 07 May 2019
None on record
Michelle Wileman Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
ALAN DONALD WILEMAN Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET MCLOUGHLIN B SC Trustee 18 May 2015
East Staffordshire and South Derbyshire Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
AMY LOUISE HOLLIS Trustee 29 November 2011
None on record
MARGARET CLARKE Trustee
None on record
JASON MARTIN HOLLIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.50k £847 £4.90k £13.55k £12.87k
Total expenditure £12.36k £5.64k £3.74k £2.00k £6.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 BRAMELL CLOSE
BRANSTON
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE14 3ES
Phone:
01283562073
Website:

No information available