SOUTH WEST BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blood bikers are volunteers who use their advanced motorcycle skills in providing an out of hours service, supporting our NHS partners to transport essential urgent supplies such as Whole Blood, Pathology Samples, Medication, Medical Equipment, Medical Notes and occasionally Donor Breast Milk to the NHS hospitals and hospices throughout Devon and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
113 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Plymouth City
- Torbay
Governance
- 01 November 2018: CIO registration
- DEVON BLOOD BIKES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stefan Miller | Trustee | 25 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Page | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Dower | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Springthorpe | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Jones | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anstis | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hopkins | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Bentley | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.65k | £39.20k | £56.90k | £108.18k | £160.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.56k | £23.15k | £42.15k | £54.71k | £89.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT OF URGENTLY NEEDED BLOOD, DRUGS, HUMAN TISSUES, AND OTHER MEDICAL REQUIREMENTS BETWEEN HOSPITALS AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION BANKS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingdom Business Centre
Kingdom House
Brunel Road
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 4PB
- Phone:
- 0300 365 2025
- Email:
- SUPPORT@SWBB.CHARITY
- Website:
-
HTTPS://WWW.SWBB.CHARITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window