FRIENDS OF JESSOP PTA

Charity Number: 1180374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent Teacher Association for Jessop Primary School in Lambeth

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £7,651
Total expenditure: £11,719

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOJ (Working name)
  • FRIENDS OF JESSOP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Jones Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £7.27k £3.73k £2.90k £4.37k £7.65k
Total expenditure £2.62k £560 £6.43k £2.13k £11.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 February 2025 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 June 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 June 2022 387 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 June 2022 752 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FRIENDS OF JESSOP PRIMARY SCHOOL
LOWDEN ROAD
LONDON
SE24 0BJ
Phone:
02072742333