Old Southendian YFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a youth football club in Southend, we have 23 teams with managers and coaches that are all volunteers and help run each of the teams. Each team run their own training sessions and play matches on a Sunday during the footballing season. We operate at Garons Park, Southend on Sea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 23 January 2019: CIO registration
- SOUTHENDIAN MANOR YOUTH FC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE LOUISE POTTER | Chair | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
GARRY DANIEL POULTON | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/03/2020 | 28/03/2021 | 28/03/2022 | 28/03/2023 | 28/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.86k | £30.82k | £25.04k | £21.49k | £23.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.95k | £21.00k | £22.18k | £21.40k | £23.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2019 as amended on 11 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL; B) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES); C) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME, OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHETHER OR NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Garon Park Golf Complex Ltd
Garon Park
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS2 4FA
- Phone:
- 07917896163
- Email:
- clarepotter200@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window