ANGLESEY FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
supporting Foster Carers, young people in care or otherwise on Anglesey, also providing activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 29 June 1982: Standard registration
- TI NI (OUR HOUSE) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Jones | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY HASELGROVE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVE HASELGROVE | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATE OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.04k | £563 | £2.32k | £1.37k | £3.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £0 | £1.50k | £2.13k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1980 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 1982, 15 JUNE 1999 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE, CHILDREN, THE AGED OR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISABILITY WHO BY REASON OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF FOSTER OR SUBSTITUTE CARE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED,IN PRACTICE YNYS MON-ISLE OF ANGLESEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Morfa
Benllech
TYN-Y-GONGL
LL74 8TF
- Phone:
- 07813083828
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window