BINCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COFFEE MORNINGS DISCOS AND ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS DISCOS AND ACTIVITIES FOR ADULTS SUPPLYING SPACE AND ACTIVITIES FOR ALL MEMBERS KEEP FIT CLASSES KNIT AND NATTER GROUP YOGA LINE DANCING CRAFT AND SPORTS WORKSHOPS GARDENING CLUB TABLE TENNIS QUIZ NIGHTS BINGO RESIDENTS MEETINGS ALLOTMENT SOCIETY Tai Chi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 30 June 1982: Standard registration
- BINCHESTER COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlie Edmond Kay | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Eckersley | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joan Harrison | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Harrison | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Jerry | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WHEATLEY | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £14.13k | £7.64k | £20.37k | £12.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.14k | £6.43k | £7.24k | £30.99k | £12.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £430 | £10.00k | N/A | £16.73k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 1979 AS AMENDED ON THE 23 AUGUST 1996.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BINCHESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
BINCHESTER AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BINCHESTER COMMUNITY CENTRE
PEEL STREET
BINCHESTER
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL14 8AS
- Phone:
- 01388235545
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window