THE PLANK STEVENSON BURSARY

Charity Number: 1179862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's purposes which are entirely charitable under English Law are to advance the education of the public and / or to benefit the public in the village of Blackthorn by making grants to schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £31,405
Total expenditure: £25,525

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALEXANDRINA AGNES STEVENSON Chair 29 October 2015
None on record
Rev CHRISTINE MARGARET GOLDIE Trustee 02 February 2018
None on record
Rathbones Trust Company Limited Trustee 29 October 2015
THE I M L D FORDE CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE DEREK HILL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE KINGFISHER SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
The Rathbones Group Foundation
Received: On time
THE LADY MARKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SILLITOE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ZENA TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELM TREE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £876 £19.25k £6.41k £4.71k £31.41k
Total expenditure £31.16k £31.45k £30.52k £25.47k £25.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RATHBONE TRUST COMPANY LIMITED
PORT OF LIVERPOOL BUILDING
PIER HEAD
LIVERPOOL
L3 1NW
Phone:
01512366666
Website:

No information available