Accounts and annual returns MAGHULL & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1179998

Charity reporting is overdue by 743 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 743 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 743 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window