Financial history COUNTY BRIDGE CLUB

Charity number: 1179979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.20k £304.18k £25.26k £28.94k £35.08k
Total expenditure £43.12k £19.67k £33.71k £45.90k £47.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £52.50k £16.79k N/A N/A