THE ALTITUDE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide long term programmes of support for young people from some of the most challenging backgrounds, providing access to the finance, social capital, opportunities and the supportive relationships needed to succeed in tertiary education and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY ANTONY SCOTT | Chair | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SCOTT | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CHRISTOPHER ORD | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THOMAS MORAN | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.66k | £107.83k | £118.03k | £217.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.01k | £103.83k | £138.57k | £158.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RESIDING IN NORTH EAST ENGLAND, WHO WISH TO STUDY TECHNOLOGY SUBJECTS AT SCHOOL AND UNIVERSITY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6th Floor
The Lumen
Newcastle Helix
Newcastle upon Tyne
- Phone:
- 01913454420
- Email:
- hello@altitudefoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window