BRECON BEACONS PARK SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society is a voluntary organisation open to everyone. Its main purpose is to advance the enhancement, protection and conservation of the countryside and other amenities of the Brecon Beacons National Park for the benefit of the public, working with other public bodies in England and Wales. The Society also runs a series of guided walks throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
- Carmarthenshire
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Monmouthshire
- Powys
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Torfaen
Governance
- 26 November 2018: CIO registration
- 14 August 2019: Funds received from 1075345 BRECON BEACONS PARK SOCIETY
- BBPS (Working name)
- CYMDEITHAS PARC BANNAU BRYCHEINIOG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Vivian Buckle | Chair | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Burden | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Katherine Jordan | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Callear | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Susan Silk | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Derek John Thomas | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Manning | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bernard O'Shea | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Hoddell BSc | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iau Counsell | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANK THOMAS | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard James Chandler | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MCBRIAR WILSON | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Bairstow Gibbs | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.86k | £14.00k | £14.11k | £15.07k | £17.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.44k | £8.86k | £8.27k | £14.07k | £11.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 26 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 03 SEP 2019 as amended on 03 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE ENHANCEMENT, PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE, THE HERITAGE AND OTHER AMENITIES OF THE BRECON BEACONS NATIONAL PARK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WAYS TO WHICH TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR HEALTHY RECREATION AND, IN PARTICULAR WALKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRECON BEACONS PARK SOCIETY
c/o CRiC
BEAUFORT STREET
CRICKHOWELL
POWYS
NP8 1BN
- Phone:
- 01873 812011
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window