FRIENDS OF THE GOETHE-INSTITUT LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the Friends of Goethe Institut London are the advancement of the arts, culture, heritage and science ......
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Susanne Pfeil | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Mercer | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Belinda Ioni Rasmussen | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPH DENIS WEAVER | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.00k | £30.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.51k | £678 | £691 | £43.21k | £748 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF GERMAN LANGUAGE, ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE AND GENERAL INTERNATIONAL CULTURAL COOPERATION, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF PROGRAMMES, EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES RELATED THERETO; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE LANGUAGE, ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE OF GERMANY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THE PRECEDING PARAGRAPH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. THIS PROVISION MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Goethe-Institut
50 Princes Gate
LONDON
SW7 2PH
- Phone:
- 02075964000
- Email:
- friends-london@goethe.de
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window