SUPERSTAR ARTS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help maintain a positive routine for people with learning disabilities & provide much needed respite for parents, families & carers. We create a strong community of learning disabled people & help to increase social awareness of LD by engaging in collaborative community art projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £108,269 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 November 2018: CIO registration
- SUPERSTAR ARTS C.I.C (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL ROSE NOBLE | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Burke | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Richard Dickinson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Joseph Taylor | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Hart | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.65k | £216.32k | £358.92k | £319.32k | £295.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.08k | £199.59k | £349.63k | £312.20k | £341.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £86.06k | £68.54k | £147.64k | £119.33k | £108.27k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 June 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 10 June 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF ANY SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF: (1) EDUCATION IN THE ARTS; AND (2) RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Kingsland Road
WORTHING
BN14 9ED
- Phone:
- 07771798484
- Email:
- info@superstararts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window