NEO COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Neo Community is a charity to support community led change in our area and empower others to support each other and create sustainable community ran resources and support offers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 January 2024
Total income:
£908,055
Donations and legacies | £186.48k | |
Charitable activities | £721.28k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £291 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£851,151
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £851.15k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £429,872 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £851.15k | |
Retained for future use | £56.90k |
People

14 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
Governance
- 22 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH BLACOW | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Luke O'Dowd | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Parsons | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Heath | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Woods | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Davies | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE FENELLA OWEN | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANNY HART | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/01/2020 | 30/01/2021 | 30/01/2022 | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.17k | £813.58k | £948.53k | £987.51k | £908.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.91k | £721.33k | £938.36k | £1.08m | £851.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £354.83k | £391.64k | £241.00k | £429.87k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.93k | £136.73k | £249.84k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £11.42k | £45.86k | £17.02k | £186.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £12.40k | £20.83k | £16.60k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £789.76k | £881.83k | £948.54k | £721.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1 | £10 | £5.35k | £291 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £721.33k | £929.26k | £1.06m | £851.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £516.08k | £0 | £0 | £2.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £205.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £9.10k | £11.67k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/01/2020 | 30/01/2021 | 30/01/2022 | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £52.93k | £47.09k | £45.96k | £49.87k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £79.34k | £321.97k | £68.59k | £50.52k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £25.76k | £252.39k | £85.47k | £14.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BY CO-ORDINATING AND DEVELOPING SERVICES FOR THE PROVISION AND DISTRIBUTION OF FOOD TO THOSE IN NEED; 2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES, INFORMATION AND ADVICE; 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF HEALTHY EATING, NUTRITION AND FOOD PREPARATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, ACTIVITIES, INFORMATION AND ADVICE DESIGNED TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH BENEFITS OF EATING A BALANCED, NUTRITIOUS DIET AND DEVELOP SKILLS IN FOOD HYGIENE, PREPARATION AND SERVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Youth Centre
Beaconsfield Close
BIRKENHEAD
CH42 3YN
- Phone:
- 01516475981
- Email:
- info@neocommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window