Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, EALING COMMON
Charity number: 1180166

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER CHARLES BARTER | Chair | 24 July 2017 |
|
|||||
James Alexander Blake | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROBERT PEARCE | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE JANE ONONO | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ELIZABETH OBERMAN | Trustee | 01 October 1999 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.