Financial history Kakilang

Charity Number: 1183582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £279.42k £223.21k £279.14k £317.59k £323.47k
Total expenditure £269.14k £189.68k £197.79k £311.37k £271.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £400 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £730 £3.00k N/A N/A