SEFTON TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING WEEKLY NEWS AND MAGAZINE CASSETTES TO BLIND AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 16 July 1982: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 November 2014: Re-registered
- NORTH MERSEYSIDE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- SEFTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- SEFTON TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Wareing | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA COOPERTHWAITE | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN O'HANLON | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDITH CLAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £100 | £1.17k | £3.95k | £2.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £2.36k | £1.96k | £2.71k | £2.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND OR SUFFERING FROM SUBSTANTIAL VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AND ARE, OR WHO HAVE BEEN, RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SEFTON
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SEFTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Lancaster Avenue
Crosby
Liverpool
L23 3DQ
- Phone:
- 01519245866
- Email:
- annlaycock36@gmail.com
- Website:
-
none.available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window