JOHN PAUL II POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN LIVERPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the organisation are to develop the cultural education of language, where children meet to learn, play and discover Polish language, geography, history and traditions. The school welcomes all children and young people age 4 -16. Pupils express themselves through art, drama, music and dance and build community cohesive projects, raising the standards of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £4,050 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 21 May 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDYTA MARIA OZAREK | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tomasz Bednarski | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Dutkiewicz | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olga Magdalena Smolen | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcin Calka | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Pilor | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dominik Kosciolowski | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marta Maria Mikulewicz | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.48k | £19.13k | £49.09k | £51.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.03k | £17.68k | £41.71k | £56.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE AND FURTHER EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN POLISH LANGUAGE, CULTURE, RELIGION AND TRADITION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL, JOHN PAUL II POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN LIVERPOOL, TEACHING ABOUT POLAND, THE POLISH LANGUAGE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ARTS AND PROVIDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, AND; B) ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL TRIPS FOR PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Primary School
Banks Road
LIVERPOOL
L19 8JY
- Phone:
- 07312422260
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window