The Dog Team UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We re-home dog meat trade survivors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 May 2019: CIO registration
- UK REHOMING OF DCMT SURVIVORS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE TREVATT M.A. | Chair | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Frost | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.78k | £6.57k | £80.16k | £78.04k | £56.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £969 | £6.55k | £63.03k | £85.82k | £53.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 January 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 11 January 2021 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2019 as amended on 23 May 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHICH HAVE SURVIVED THE DOG AND CAT MEAT TRADE, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Fields
Middleton-by-Wirksworth
Matlock
Derbyshi
- Phone:
- 07957293733
- Email:
- thedogteamuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
thedogteamuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window