BOOKS FOR CHILDREN WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Burma
- India
Governance
- 22 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOSHIKO YAMAGUCHI | Chair |
|
||||||
PAUL RICHARD GREGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP SOLOMONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1315 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1315 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1680 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1680 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF BOOKS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND MATERIALS TO ESTABLISHED ORGANISATIONS SUCH AS SCHOOLS, ORPHANAGES AND CHILDREN'S HOMES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR IN INDIA AND BURMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT9
42 Onslow Gardens
LONDON
SW7 3PY
- Phone:
- 00447868607108
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window