Financial history ESTHERS FOR THE NATIONS

Charity number: 1182748
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.08k £15.40k £5.46k £839 £961
Total expenditure £18.91k £8.60k £9.42k £2.60k £350
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A