INTERNATIONAL BUDDHIST TRUST UK DEDICATED TO BHIKKHU CHANDRAMANI, THE DIKSHA GURU OF DR. B. R. AMBEDKAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly meditation and discussion class. Monthly on a Sunday Dhamma talk and discussion, and at other times by appointment. Chanting and Dhamma talk held monthly on Full Moon Days and special events on Wesakh and Kathina every year. Conduct funerals and wedding ceremony. Counselling, advice and guidance according to the teaching of the Buddha. Support interfaith activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ven SRAMNER TEJWANT | Chair | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ven Bhikshu Gyaneshwar | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chaman Lal Midha | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pradnya Katkar | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
AVINASH SITARAM SHINDE | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.31k | £6.73k | £8.76k | £8.63k | £7.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £7.49k | £11.76k | £8.78k | £7.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 July 2024 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2024 | 536 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 April 2024 | 798 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2024 | 1163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
Ò TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST FAITH AND EDUCATION IN BUDDHISM, MEDITATION AND MINDFULNESS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. Ò TO SUPPORT THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ONE OR MORE BUDDHA VIHARAS (BUDDHIST CENTRES) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS A BASE FOR THE ABBOT AND OTHER BUDDHIST MONKS, NUNS AND LAY PEOPLE TO TEACH AND PRACTISE BUDDHISM. Ò TO PROMOTE BUDDHISM THROUGH BUILDING AND MAINTAINING LINKS WITH OTHER BUDDHIST ORGANISATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD. Ò TO DEMONSTRATE BUDDHISM IN PRACTICE BY RELIEVING SUFFERING THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THOSE EXPERIENCING POVERTY, ILLNESS, DISADVANTAGE AND THE EFFECTS OF NATURAL DISASTERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Woodfield Avenue
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV4 4AF
- Phone:
- 01902218670
- Email:
- int.buddhist.tstuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window