Financial history THE NELSON MASJID COMMITTEE (GHOSIA JAMIA MOSQUE)

Charity Number: 512891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £645.99k £371.15k £774.78k £481.23k £654.97k
Total expenditure £611.57k £220.35k £775.27k £291.90k £390.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £645.99k N/A £736.73k N/A £442.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £177.39k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 N/A £14.24k
Income - Other £0 N/A £38.05k N/A £20.86k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £611.57k N/A £518.44k N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £256.83k N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £390.96k