SHIRLEY MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote social inclusion by preventing men aged 18 or over in the area from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, by providing facilities in which they can meet to undertake creative, physical or recreational activities, learn or pass on skills and knowledge, and support each other socially.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Southampton City
Governance
- 02 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Langley | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Lockwood | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony Wood | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kenneth Blunsden | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Rolfe | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN RICHARD HOOPER | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
HUGH EVANS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.99k | £18.89k | £28.51k | £16.16k | £6.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £959 | £20.71k | £23.29k | £14.22k | £7.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN SHIRLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS; UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT, POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 JANSON ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 5GJ
- Phone:
- 02380510309
- Website:
-
shed.stjamesroad.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window