Accounts and annual returns ACTION ON HOMELESSNESS IN FOLKESTONE

Charity number: 1180637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 30 July 2024 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 30 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required