ACTION ON HOMELESSNESS IN FOLKESTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of hot meals and general support services, including clothing, bedding, and accommodation equipment together with assistance with obtaining medical help, contact with other agencies and other counselling services for homeless people and those in need in Folkestone and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Frederick Brooker | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Fraser | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £10.85k | £9.93k | £12.65k | £15.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.54k | £0 | £6.22k | £10.86k | £15.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF THE PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS AND ROUGH SLEEPERS IN FOLKESTONE BY THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND SERVICES, AND BY WORKING WITH OTHER AGENCIES TO PROVIDE SUCH ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4 Clifton Mews
15 Clifton Crescent
Folkestone
Kent
CT20 2EL
- Phone:
- 0734 076 3955
- Email:
- aohifolkestone@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window