HEATHROW MULTI FAITH CHAPLAINCY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The supply of chaplains to Heathrow Airport to support the travelling public, staff of Heathrow, and visitors to Heathrow. Religious services at Heathrow Airport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- 03 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Venerable Catherine Ruth Pickford | Chair | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Susan Preston | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sangeeta Vishwanath | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hobbs | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER MATTHEW PENTY | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER SINGH MUDHAR | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Hitesh Chander SHARMA | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ASGAR HALIM RAJPUT | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hany William Yacoub Abdelmasih | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN LEON HIRST | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £5.00k | £67.90k | £102.57k | £161.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £150 | £29.97k | £53.17k | £81.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 03 APR 2019 AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2020 as amended on 11 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MULTI FAITH CHAPLAINCY FACILITIES AT LONDON HEATHROW AIRPORT TO PROVIDE APPROPRIATE WORSHIP AND PASTORAL CARE FOR THOSE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE AND LENDING EMOTIONAL, SPIRITUAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Compass Centre
Nelson Road
London Heathrow Airport
HOUNSLOW
TW6 2GW
- Phone:
- 07590170595
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window