Financial history EAST HORSLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1180168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £117.62k £64.36k £87.45k £89.06k £88.17k
Total expenditure £95.88k £68.66k £108.58k £91.50k £87.92k
Income from government contracts £3.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.18k £24.76k N/A N/A