Trustees EAST HORSLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1180168

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Hughes | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Edwards | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Haling | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hunt | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Tinkler | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Straughen | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Parker | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER TALLON | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Goodwin | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.