THE MILL HOUSE ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care and protection of animals, and in particular horses, who are in need of care and attention by reason of old age, sickness, maltreatment, neglect, poor circumstances, or other similar causes deemed worthy by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 July 1982: Standard registration
- MILLHOUSE ANIMAL SANCTUARY (Working name)
- MILL HOUSE ANIMAL SANCTUARY (Previous name)
- SAVE OUR OLD TIRED HORSES AND OTHER ANIMALS SOCIETY (MILLHOUSE ANIMAL SANCTUARY) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Hartley | Chair | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hart | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN HEDGES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCIS CUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ANN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.37k | £215.38k | £217.36k | £143.41k | £57.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.63k | £126.71k | £174.62k | £171.65k | £134.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ANIMALS AND IN PARTICULAR HORSES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, NEGLECT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THORNE ROYD
HORNTHWAITE HILL ROAD
THURLSTONE
SHEFFIELD
S36 9QL
- Phone:
- 07980 992589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window