AINA CHRISTIAN CENTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spreading the Gospel of Jesus Christ through teaching and teaching in many different formats. Doing pastoral care and chaplaincy work by visiting and comforting the sick, prisoners and bereaved families. Support and guidance to youths, men and women in needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVAN EKWAKOLA NASENA | Chair | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
THABITA LUZITU | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEO EMMANUEL SIKI | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/01/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £32.11k | £37.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £28.87k | £36.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 April 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 April 2022 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 January 2020 | 18 April 2022 | 529 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF; 2.THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING THROUGHOUT LONDON EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dickens House
Dominion Business Park
Goodwin Road
LONDON
N9 0BG
- Phone:
- 07494263116
- Email:
- AINACHURCHENFIELD@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window