MARK MILSOME FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to encourage and support young people between the ages 18 to 25 who display the qualities needed to thrive in the British Film and Television industry by way of Awarding scholarships, maintenance allowances or grants Providing mentorship and work placements to better prepare for work in the Film & Television industry and increasing their chances of long term employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Wainstein | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abbi Collins | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Junior Agyeman-Owusu | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Layton | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Gabrielle Allen | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Lewis Defis | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Virginia Tannahill | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suntosh Kumary Bains | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edwin Sindall | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Joseph Gerard Hickey | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDRA SUZANNE MILSOME | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.31k | £31.34k | £63.62k | £71.26k | £79.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.51k | £36.23k | £111.35k | £57.67k | £62.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 APR 2018 as amended on 16 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit to advance education by carrying out activities including (but not limited to) the: 1. awarding of maintenance allowances, grants and scholarships; and 2. delivery of training and mentorship, to improve awareness and education in relation to topics including (but not limited to) health and safety or any other subject related to the film and television industry, including working in the industry and supporting positive working practices in it
Contact information
- Address:
-
Third Floor
104-108 Oxford Street
London
W1D 1LP
- Phone:
- 02070162450
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
markmilsomefoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window