Financial history LIVERPOOL AND SOUTH WEST LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 512906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.19k £13.55k £11.98k £13.92k £13.37k
Total expenditure £11.39k £10.17k £10.99k £10.97k £12.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A