LIVERPOOL AND SOUTH WEST LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society continues the service it began over 30 years ago. 6 groups offer help and support in researching family history in each of the areas covered by the Society and informational talks and group meetings are offered throughout the year. 10 help desks are run in conjunction with local libraries over a 50 mile radius. A vastly improved website is now available to both members and non members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
63 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 July 1982: Standard registration
- LIVERPOOL AND DISTRICT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Croft | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Allan | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Shaw | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Whitehead | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Anyon | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Atkins | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Barry Peacock | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Boardman | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.19k | £13.55k | £11.98k | £13.92k | £13.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.39k | £10.17k | £10.99k | £10.97k | £12.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/1993 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2011 as amended on 16 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY.
Area of benefit
THE PART OF LANCASHIRE KNOWN AS THE HUNDRED OF WEST DERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Ledger Road
Haydock
ST. HELENS
WA11 0DX
- Phone:
- 01744731287
- Email:
- secretary@lswlfhs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window