HARROGATE TOWN AFC CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using the power of football our vision is to create and maintain a healthy, happy and connected Harrogate & District. We work tirelessly to motivate, educate, inspire and empower all people to achieve their potential and improve their quality of life. Our primary objectives are to: improve health & wellbeing, foster stronger, safer more active communities and enhance life chances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £23,962 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 December 2019: CIO registration
- 28 July 2022: Funds received from 1158506 ARCH RESOLUTION
- HARROGATE TOWN AFC CIO (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION) (Previous name)
- HARROGATE TOWN AFC COMMUNITY FOUNDATION CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Snape | Chair | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Riley | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jack Hannon | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Craig Buchan | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Ashton-Jones | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Mark Jenkins | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Emily Megan Steed | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Barry | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Macrae | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £222.39k | £253.46k | £253.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £165.80k | £295.79k | £210.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.38k | N/A | £23.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 09 DEC 2019 AMENDED ON 09 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF HARROGATE AND DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS: (1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH AND FITNESS (FACILITIES IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS, LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES). (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH AND FITNESS, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrogate Town AFC CIO
Community House
46-50 East Parade
Harrogate
- Phone:
- 07465290222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window