Accounts and annual returns MANSTON HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1179982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 November 2024 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 November 2024 280 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 May 2023 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 May 2023 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 June 2022 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 June 2022 147 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 June 2021 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 June 2021 134 days late Download Open in new window