MANSTON HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The History of RAF Manston and its surrounding satellites at RAF Ash, RAF Sandwich and RAF Dunkirk. This is achieved through increasing its collection of artefacts and through maintenance of existing exhibits, and providing an insight into the history through its museum and events. this is in furtherance of the charity's objectives as set out in its constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 19 September 2018: Standard registration
- 14 July 2021: Funds received from 1075396 ROYAL AIR FORCE MANSTON HISTORY MUSEUM ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Groombridge | Chair | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Izzard | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lawrence | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Wray | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Everall | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeannene Groombridge | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doug Smith | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dale Howlett | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE BROOKS | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.81k | £89.44k | £173.87k | £160.63k | £192.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.58k | £62.52k | £75.61k | £85.24k | £147.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 280 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCES , PRACTICE AND HISTORY OF AVIATION RELATING TO MANSTON AIRFIELD AND ITS AVIATION CONNECTIONS WITH THANET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAF Manston History Museum
Manston Road
Ramsgate
CT12 5DF
- Phone:
- 01843825224
- Email:
- info@rafmanston.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window