Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NEWBOLD VERDON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1181066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2023 09 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2021 12 May 2023 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2020 10 April 2022 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2019 15 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 Not Required