Accounts and annual returns TURN THE TIDE BLACKPOOL

Charity Number: 1182156
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 October 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 20 October 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 20 October 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 20 October 2019 18 September 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2019 18 September 2020 29 days late