ST CUTHBERT'S CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Cuthbert's Care undertakes social welfare work which benefits the public as a whole. The Charity's services - residential care for children and adults, respite care for profoundly disabled people, day care, social work, fostering, and community work - help care for and support children, adults and families throughout the North East and represent the Charity's principal activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£12,517,644
Donations and legacies | £472.68k | |
Charitable activities | £11.53m | |
Other trading activities | £436.43k | |
Investments | £79.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£11,811,677
Raising funds | £156.16k | |
Charitable activities | £11.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £9,247,782 from 257 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £156.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.66m | |
Retained for future use | £705.97k |
People

293 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 28 July 1982: Standard registration
- Alan Shearer Foundation (Working name)
- SCC (Working name)
- CATHOLIC CARE NORTH EAST (Previous name)
- ST CUTHBERTS CARE (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Moran | Chair | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Right Rev Stephen Wright LLB, STL | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Kathryn Mannix FRCP | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Johnson | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|||||
kathleen Urwin | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS Alexander GILBERT ACMA | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE DICKSON MBE | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.82m | £9.80m | £10.16m | £10.55m | £12.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.74m | £9.67m | £9.95m | £10.53m | £11.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.75m | £9.12m | £7.70m | £8.28m | £9.25m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £281.21k | £290.27k | £16.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £275.26k | £216.01k | £317.19k | £264.79k | £472.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £304.50k | £177.27k | £304.41k | £355.07k | £436.43k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.23m | £9.40m | £9.54m | £9.91m | £11.53m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.57k | £4.91k | £879 | £18.76k | £79.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £35.47k | £51.50k | £26.02k | £11.90k | £228.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.63m | £9.64m | £9.83m | £10.41m | £11.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £112.65k | £30.23k | £122.01k | £125.14k | £156.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.96k | £31.52k | £29.28k | £42.36k | £29.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.49m | £5.18m | £5.00m | £4.94m | £5.13m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.42m | £3.08m | £3.23m | £3.33m | £3.99m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.02m | £1.25m | £999.95k | £1.03m | £1.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUN 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JAN 2017 as amended on 25 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
6. Objects The objects (Objects) for which the Charity is established are to undertake all such forms of social welfare work as the Charity with the approval of the Bishop considers appropriate (being forms of work which are lawful charitable objects) including (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing): 6.1 acting as a post-adoption agency; 6.2 providing fostering and related services; 6.3 providing residential accommodation, care and support for children and young people; 6.4 providing nursing homes, care and support for older people; 6.5 providing facilities, services, care and support for people with physical or mental disability; and 6.6 carrying on community projects for people living in poverty, isolation or other need.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. CUTHBERTS CARE
ST. CUTHBERTS HOUSE
WEST ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 7PY
- Phone:
- 01912280111
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window