MONMOUTH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aim of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 21 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan David Greaves | Chair | 11 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lambertus Bernardus Weenink | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hopkins | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ms Elizabeth Grace Alderson | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Roger Endicott | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mr Michael Alfred North | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Richard McLachlan | Trustee | 09 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mr Alan Nicol Cochran | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Vandervelden | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mr Clive Graham Wiggins | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mr David Carfrae Adams | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.90k | £242.90k | £177.14k | £117.74k | £180.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.15k | £139.12k | £142.12k | £136.65k | £158.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 AUG 2018 as amended on 12 Feb 2019 as amended on 14 Sep 2021 as amended on 14 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 MONK STREET
MONMOUTH
NP25 3LR
- Phone:
- 01600716423
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window