NEW BEGINNING MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have regular church services on sunday mornings where we worship, hear from God and spend time in fellowship. Also we have Bible studys, homeless meals throughout the week, hour prayer and Monthly worship nights where we encounter with God for three hours
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 March 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Solomon Raj Monica | Chair | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anton Toussaint Spencer | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Toussaint Leigh | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Raj Amal | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|||||
MELVINE ALONG | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.76k | £22.18k | £23.24k | £30.55k | £684 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.56k | £16.35k | £22.11k | £38.42k | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE NEW BEGINNING MINISTRIES IS A GROWING PENTECOSAL MOVEMENT IN THE UNITED KINDOM. OUR PURPOSE IS TO IGNITE TODAYS GENERATION FOR CHRIST AND TO LEAD PEOPLE TO JESUS, MAKE THEM AS HIS DISCIPLES AND TO TEACH TO TO WORSHIP THE LORD. ALSO STUDYING THE WORD IS GOD REGUARLY THROUGH A BIBLE STUDY. WE SUPPORT THE HOMELSS WEEKLY BY HOLDING A WEEKLY MEAL FOR THEM TO FEED THEM, ALSO PRAYING FOR THEM.BY ORGANISING REGUARLY EVENTS SUCH AS GOSPEL MEETINGS, WORSHIP NIGHT, YOUTH CAMP AND FAMILY CAMPS WE CAN ENGAGE MORE PEOPLE IN THE WORD OF GOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Stour Lodge
Fulwood
Preston
Lancashire
PR2 3EY
- Phone:
- 01772715210
- Email:
- nbmpreston@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window