BILBOROUGH ISLAMIC CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing daily prayer facilities for the muslim community of Bilborough and surrounding areas evening Quran classes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 November 2018: Standard registration
- BILBOROUGH COMMUNITY AND EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramiz Ahmed | Chair | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
NASEEM AKRAM | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
TAHIR MAHMOOD | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NAVID ARIF | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MALIK | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392.66k | £38.22k | £35.10k | £94.33k | £77.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £389.12k | £11.67k | £20.81k | £100.81k | £63.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 February 2021 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 February 2021 | 237 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION, TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, IN ACCORDANCE STRICTLY WITH THE DOCTRINE FRAMEWORK AND METHODOLOGY OF TABLEEGHI JAMAAT WITH TRADITIONS BASED ON THE QUR'AN AND SUNNAH (WHICH MUST BE STRICTLY IN ADHERENCE WITH THE AHLUS-SUNNAH-WAL-JAMAÆAH (NECESSARILY IN ALIGNMENT WITH THE HANAFI FIQH ONLY)ACCORDING TO ULAMA-E-DEOBAND) AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND EDUCATION; II. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMS, CLASSES, SEMINARS AND FUNCTIONS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bilborough Islamic Centre
Wigman Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 4PB
- Phone:
- 07764356881
- Email:
- BILBOROUGHIC@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window