MCKITTRICK BIRD SONG CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to further such charitable purposes as the trustees see fit from time to time including: (a) the advancement of education for the public benefit; (b) the promotion of the conservation of the song bird; (c) to relieve the needs of ex-military personnel; (d) the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship anywhere in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- Nepal
- Scotland
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 29 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Callander | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Murray Drummond Simpson | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Gavin John Hugh Pollock CA | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £553.17k | £107.00k | £845.55k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £1.80k | £2.69k | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £553.17k | N/A | £845.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.50k | N/A | £2.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.50k | N/A | £2.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2021
(These accounts |
26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH AND WELSH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING: · THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT · THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION OF THE SONG BIRD · TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF EX-MILITARY PERSONNEL · THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clarke Mairs Llp
1 One Hood Street
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 6JQ
- Phone:
- 01912454737
- Email:
- law@clarkemairs.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window